EP0269800 - Continuous-flow heaters for personal need apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wonka, Boris Beethovenstrasse 78 D-6078 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [1988/23] | Application number, filing date | 87113585.1 | 17.09.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863637378 | 03.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3637378 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269800 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269800 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/82, A47J31/54, H05B1/02, F24H1/14 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
A47J31/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/23] | Title | German: | Durchlauferhitzer für Geräte des persönlichen Bedarfs | [1988/23] | English: | Continuous-flow heaters for personal need apparatuses | [1988/23] | French: | Chauffe-eau instantanés pour appareils à usage personnel | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.1993
29.06.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fritz Eichenauer GmbH & Co. KG Fabrik elektrischer Spezialartikel Industriestrasse 1 D-76770 Hatzenbühl / DE Opponent's representative Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bergwaldstrasse 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.1993
29.06.1993
ADMISSIBLE Fritz Eichenauer GmbH & Co. KG Fabrik elektrischer Spezialartikel Industriestrasse 1 D-76770 Hatzenbühl / DE Opponent's representative Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Bergwaldstrasse 1 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02.07.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.12.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.12.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/26] | Appeal following opposition | 15.07.1994 | Appeal received No. T0592/94 | 09.08.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.12.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 10.12.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.1996 | GB | 17.09.1996 | CH | 30.09.1996 | FR | 30.09.1996 | LI | 30.09.1996 | [2002/33] |
Former [1998/04] | AT | 17.09.1996 | |
GB | 17.09.1996 | ||
CH | 30.09.1996 | ||
LI | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 17.09.1996 | |
GB | 17.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2530296 [ ] (ELPAG AG CHUR); | EP0170992 [ ] (ELPAG AG CHUR [CH]) |