EP0261607 - Biocides for treating industrial waters, particularly flue gas desulfurization scrubber sludge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouche, Richard J. 654 North Batavia Road Batavia Illinois 60510 / US | 02 /
Lin, Mei-Jan, L. 8 S. 325 Wehrli Road Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113703.0 | 18.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860911853 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 911853 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261607 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261607 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/50 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
C02F1/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1988/13] | Title | German: | Biozide Mittel zur Behandlung gewerblicher Abwässer, insbesondere Gaswascherschlämme | [1988/13] | English: | Biocides for treating industrial waters, particularly flue gas desulfurization scrubber sludge | [1988/13] | French: | Composés biocides pour le traitement d'eaux industrielles, en particulier pour les boues provenant d'un laveur de gaz | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 18.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2801216 ; | [Y]GB2118925 ; | [A]GB2138799 ; | [X]US4495200 ; | [A]US3973034 ; | [A]EP0129315 ; | [A]US3892588 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 26, June 30, 1980, page 130, Ref. No. 217683j; Columbus, Ohio, US; T.A. KUZNETSOVA et al.: "Effect of bactericides on sulfate-reducing bacteria", & Neftepromysl, Delo 1980, (1), 32-4 | [Y] - Lehr- und Handbuch der Abwassertechnik, 3rd Ed., Vol. VI: "Organisch verschmutzte Abwaesser sonstiger Industriegruppen", February 1986; Ernst & Sohn, Berlin, DE | [O] - Colloqium Int. Bacteriology, March 2, 1984, & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 108, No. 1, January 4, 1988, page 160, Ref No. 1641v; Columbus, Ohio, US; & Ifremer 1986, 3, 617-19 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 102, No. 11, March 18, 1985, page 289, Ref. No. 92444y; Columbus, Ohio, US; C.C. GAYLARDE et al.: "Some recommendations for sulfate-reducing bacteria biocide tests", & J. Oil Colour Chem. Assoc. 1984, 67(12), 305-9 |