EP0261617 - Dosage dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Wilhelm Georg-Speyer-Strasse 64 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Springer, Hans Jörg, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Springer, Hans Jörg, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113730.3 | 19.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | DE19863632546 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3632546 | [1988/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261617 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261617 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D53/04 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
B65D83/0409 (EP,US);
B65D2583/0495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Dosierspender | [1988/13] | English: | Dosage dispenser | [1988/13] | French: | Distributeur doseur | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 01.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 31.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2761592 (LEWIS HOWARD B, et al); | [A]US3527383 (BORSUM ADOLPH W, et al); | [A]US3991908 (THOMAS MICHAEL D, et al); | [A]EP0002403 (SUPPO STERIL LAB [FR]) |