EP0261625 - Human B-cell differentiation factor and process of producing said factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honjo, Tasuku Higashi-1-jo-agaru, Nishi-iru, Izumidono-cho Yoshida, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi 606 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states Honjo, Tasuku Higashi-1-jo-agaru, Nishi-iru, Izumidono-cho Yoshida, Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi 606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honjo, Tasuku 3-13-12, Uenohigashi Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Takatu, Kiyoshi 301-32, Ishihara-machi Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | 03 /
Severinson, Eva c/o Department of Immunology Biology Building F. Stockholm University S-106 91 Stockholm / SE | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113774.1 | 21.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | JP19860223284 | 20.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22328486 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261625 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261625 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261625 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C12N15/00, C07H21/04 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/5409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Menschlicher B-Zellen-Differenzierungsfaktor und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1988/13] | English: | Human B-cell differentiation factor and process of producing said factor | [1988/13] | French: | Facteur de différenciation de cellule-B humaine et son procédé de préparation | [1988/13] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/25] | 11.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.01.1991 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO8704466 (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]) | [XP] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 14, no. 22, November 1986, pages 9149-9158, IRL Press Ltd., Oxford, GB; C. AZUMA et al.: "Cloning of cDNA for human T-cell replacing factor (interleukin-5) and comparison with the murine homologue" | [XP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 84, June 1987, pages 4234-4238, Washington, US; K. TAKATSU et al.: "Interleukin 5, a T-cell-derived B-cell differentiation factor also induces cytotoxic T lymphocytes" | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 21, May 1987, page 152, no. 169856b, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. KINASHI et al.: "Cloning of cDNA for T-cell replacing factor and identity with B-cell growth factor II" & JUNTENDO IGAKU 1986, 32(4), 435-41 |