EP0262570 - Photosensitive member comprising charge generating layer and charge transporting layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINOLTA CAMERA KABUSHIKI KAISHA Osaka Kokusai Building 30, Azuchi-machi 2-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states Minolta Camera Kabushiki Kaisha Osaka Kokusai Building 30, Azuchi-machi 2-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iino, Syuji 1-11-19,Mitsuya-Cho Hirakata-Shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Osawa, Izumi 51-109,3, Shiroyama-Cho Ikeda-Shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hotomi, Hideo C-4-1104, Katayamakoen-Danchi,34,Deguchi-Cho Suita-Shi, Osaka / JP | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113880.6 | 23.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | JP19860229392 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22939286 | JP19860229393 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22939386 | JP19860229396 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22939686 | JP19860229397 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22939786 | JP19860229431 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22943186 | JP19860229432 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22943286 | JP19860229435 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22943586 | JP19860229436 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22943686 | JP19860229439 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22943986 | JP19860229440 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22944086 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262570 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262570 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/08, G03G5/14 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
G03G5/08221 (EP,US);
G03G5/0433 (EP,US);
G03G5/08278 (EP,US);
G03G5/08285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/14] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches Element mit ladungserzeugender Schicht und Ladungstransportschicht | [1988/14] | English: | Photosensitive member comprising charge generating layer and charge transporting layer | [1988/14] | French: | Elément photosensible comprenant une couche génératrice de charges et une couche de transport de charges | [1988/14] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/02] | 14.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4559289 (SUNAGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JPS5912448 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 101 (P-273)[1538]12th May 1984; & JP-A-59 012 448 (RICOH K.K.) 23-01-1984 |