EP0267394 - Process to draw off the gases in metal smelting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnapp, Herbert Mendener-Strasse 26 D-5205 St. Augustin 1 / DE | [1988/20] | Application number, filing date | 87113901.0 | 23.09.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | DE19863634211 | 08.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3634211 | [1988/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267394 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267394 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0267394 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F27D7/04, F27B14/08 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
F27D17/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Absaugen der Abluft bei Metallschmelzen | [1988/20] | English: | Process to draw off the gases in metal smelting | [1988/20] | French: | Procédé pour l'aspiration des gaz dans la coulée de métal | [1988/20] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE634450 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE1210132 (WESTOFEN GMBH); | [A]EP0063669 (DANECO DANIELI ECOLOGIA SPA [IT]) |