EP0261662 - Method for removal of iodine in gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atomic Energy Bureau, Science and Technologie Agency, the Government of Japan 2-2-1 Kasumigaseki Chiyodaku Tokyo / JP | [1988/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Takaaki 2-5-7 Kitano Mitakashi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Norihiko 3-6-2 Kyounancho Musashinoshi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kumagai, Mikio 4-7-5-204 Matsubacho Kashiwashi Chibaken / JP | 04 /
Sazarashi, Masami 1307-2 Nishioowada Yamazaki Nodahi Chibaken / JP | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/13] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113910.1 | 23.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | JP19860227048 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22704886 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261662 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261662 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/02 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
G21F9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Jod aus einem Gas | [1988/13] | English: | Method for removal of iodine in gas | [1988/13] | French: | Méthode pour enlever l'iode d'un gaz | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 23.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4370306 ; | [A]US3429655 |