blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0263403

EP0263403 - Novel microorganism and method for producing oxygenous compounds with said microorganism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.1994 [1994/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED
1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/15]For all designated states
IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED
1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uchiumi, Toshiki, c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co.Ltd.
No. 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Muramoto, Takahisa, c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co.Ltd.
No. 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Suzuki, Motoshi, c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co.Ltd.
No. 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun, Chiba-ken / JP
[1993/16]
Former [1988/15]01 / Uchiumi, Toshiki IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED
No. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Muramoto, Takahisa IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED
No. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Suzuki, Motoshi IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED
No. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi
Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP
Representative(s)Türk, Dietmar, et al
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/15]Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date87114172.729.09.1987
[1988/15]
Priority number, dateJP1986023441503.10.1986         Original published format: JP 23441586
[1988/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0263403
Date:13.04.1988
Language:EN
[1988/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0263403
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0263403
Date:21.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:C12N1/20, C12P17/00, C12P7/00, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:01)
[1988/15]
CPC:
C12N1/205 (EP); C12P17/00 (EP); C12P17/02 (EP);
C12P7/00 (EP); C12P7/04 (EP); C12P7/16 (EP);
C12P7/22 (EP); C12R2001/01 (EP); Y02E50/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/15]
TitleGerman:Mikroorganismus und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Oxydationsverbindungen mit diesem Mikroorganismus[1988/15]
English:Novel microorganism and method for producing oxygenous compounds with said microorganism[1988/15]
French:Micro-organisme et procédé de production de composés oxygénés avec ce micro-organisme[1988/15]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure04.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/05]
19.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.09.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.1992Fee for grant paid
11.12.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.01.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH21.04.1993
LI21.04.1993
[1994/03]
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1603864  (NAT RES DEV);
 [X]GB2018822  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 [A]GB2019390  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 [A]EP0088602  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US])
 [AD]  - JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 61, 1970, pages 205-218, Colchester, (GB) R. WHITTENBURY et al.: "Enrichment, Isolation and Some Properties of Methane-utilizing Bacteria"
 [A]  - DETERMINATIVE BACTERIOLOGY, 8th Edition, 1975, The Williams & Wilkins Company, Baltimore, (US) R.E. BUCHMANN et al.: "Bergey's Manual of Determinative Bacteriology", page 269
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.