EP0262688 - Apparatus for aligning pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dearman, Timothy C. 452 Wildwood Lane Rt. 3 Lugoff South Caroline 29508 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states Dearman, Timothy C. 452 Wildwood Lane Rt. 3 Lugoff South Caroline 29508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114526.4 | 05.10.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | US19860915055 | 03.10.1986 Original published format: US 915055 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262688 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262688 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262688 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/04 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B23K37/0533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1988/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten von Rohren | [1988/14] | English: | Apparatus for aligning pipes | [1988/14] | French: | Dispositif pour aligner des tubes | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3467295 (WATSON ROBERT L); | [AD]US3593402 (MORI MASUNORI); | [AD]US3653574 (DEARMAN TIMOTHY C); | [AD]US3666159 (WATSON ROBERT L); | [AD]US3705453 (OLSON NEIL W); | [X]BE827453 ; | [AD]US3901497 (DEARMAN TIMOTHY C); | [AD]US3944202 (DEARMAN TIMOTHY C); | [X]DE3121073 (JANKUS HEINRICH); | [AD]US4586647 (DEARMAN TIMOTHY C [US]) |