EP0264058 - Body construction part for a utility vehicle, e.g. a fire protection vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco Magirus Aktiengesellschaft Schillerstrasse 2 Postfach 27 40 D-89017 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states Iveco Magirus Aktiengesellschaft Schillerstrasse 2 Postfach 27 40 D-89017 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seidel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Eberhardtstrasse 44 D-7900 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Arlt, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Hans-Acker-Weg 1 D-7900 Ulm / DE | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | Socha, Peter c/o Eberspächer GmbH & Co, Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | Socha, Peter Iveco Magirus AG Postfach 2740 Schillerstrasse 2 D-7900 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114639.5 | 07.10.1987 | [1988/16] | Priority number, date | DE19863635039 | 15.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3635039 | [1988/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264058 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264058 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264058 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/04, B62D27/02 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
A62C27/00 (EP);
B62D27/02 (EP);
F16B37/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/16] | Title | German: | Kastenkonstruktion, insbesondere für Nutzfahrzeuge wie beispielsweise Brandschutzfahrzeuge | [1988/16] | English: | Body construction part for a utility vehicle, e.g. a fire protection vehicle | [1988/16] | French: | Construction de caisse, en particulier pour véhicule utilitaire, par exemple véhicule de lutte contre l'incendie | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3296759 (JOHN PAVLECKA); | [A]DE1924009 (STAUFEN FAHRZEUGWERKE EISLINGE); | [A]DE2600816 (NEXUS MFG LTD) |