EP0276371 - Process for treating metal surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Dacro Shamrock Co. Ltd. 49-5 Shimokochi Shimokurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states Nippon Dacro Shamrock Co. Ltd. 49-5 Shimokochi Shimokurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Toshio 589-27, Iijima-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ayukawa, Nobuhiro 16-5, Shichirigahama-Higashi 4-chome Kamakura Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114670.0 | 08.10.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870001824 | 09.01.1987 Original published format: JP 182487 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276371 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276371 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/04, C23C22/03 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
C23C22/03 (EP);
C23C22/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Metalloberflächen | [1988/31] | English: | Process for treating metal surface | [1988/31] | French: | Procédé de traitement de surfaces métalliques | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.03.1991 | SE | 20.03.1991 | ES | 07.10.1991 | GB | 08.10.1991 | BE | 31.10.1991 | CH | 31.10.1991 | LI | 31.10.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1993/13] | SE | 20.03.1991 | |
FR | 09.08.1991 | ||
GB | 08.10.1991 | ||
BE | 31.10.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/38] | SE | 20.03.1991 | |
FR | 09.08.1991 | ||
BE | 31.10.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | SE | 20.03.1991 | |
FR | 09.08.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/19] | SE | 20.03.1991 | |
FR | 09.08.1991 | ||
Former [1991/43] | SE | 20.03.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3285788 (ELDO SVADLENAK RUDOLF); | [YD]EP0170988 (NIPPON DACRO SHAMROCK CO [JP]); | [AD]FR2304685 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]); | [A]EP0089456 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [AD]FR2304684 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]); | [AD]US3437531 (SVADLENAK RUDOLF E); | [A]US2927046 (ANDRADE DONALD S) |