EP0264739 - Method and apparatus for forming a polycristalline monolayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHOTON ENERGY, INC. d/b/a GOLDEN PHOTON, INC. 4545 McIntyre Street Golden, Colorado 80403 / US | [1993/16] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states PHOTON ENERGY, INC. 13 Founders Boulevard El Paso Texas 79906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albright, Scot P. 4433 N. Stanton, No 212 El Paso Texas 79906 / US | 02 /
Brown, David K. B-5 Statesburg Canutillo Texas 79835 / US | 03 /
Jordon, John F. 6020 Pinehurst Drive El Paso Texas 79912 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114766.6 | 09.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | US19860918115 | 14.10.1986 Original published format: US 918115 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264739 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264739 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264739 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/02, H01L31/18 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
H01L31/186 (EP,US);
H01L31/03365 (EP,US);
H01L31/0368 (EP,US);
H01L31/1828 (EP,US);
Y02E10/543 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer polykristallinen Schicht | [1988/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming a polycristalline monolayer | [1988/17] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour produire une couche polycristalline | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.03.1993 | [1993/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2020856 (PHOTON POWER INC); | [A]US4388483 (BASOL BULENT M, et al); | [Y]GB2149964 (TOTH OTTILIA F, et al) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, vol. 21, no. 3, March 1986, pages 980-984, Chapman and Hall Ltd, London, GB; J.S. LEE et al.: "Effects of junction formation conditions on the photovoltaic properties of sintered CdS/CdTe solar cells" | [A] - REVUE DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE, vol. 15, no. 3, March 1980, pages 585-593; M. PEROTIN et al.: "CdS "spray": élaboration. Propriétés physiques applications aux cellules solaires Cu2S-CdS" |