EP0264083 - Silver halide photographic material and method of forming a dye image thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hirokazu c/o Konishiroku Photo Industry Co., Ltd. No. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / US | 02 /
Hirabayashi, Shigeto c/o Konishiroku Photo Industry Co., Ltd. No. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / US | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114810.2 | 10.10.1987 | [1988/16] | Priority number, date | JP19860242785 | 13.10.1986 Original published format: JP 24278586 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264083 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264083 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264083 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/34, G03C7/26 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
G03C7/3006 (EP,US);
G03C7/39236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/16] | Title | German: | Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zur Bildung eines Farbbildes darauf | [1988/16] | English: | Silver halide photographic material and method of forming a dye image thereon | [1988/16] | French: | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et procédé de formation d'une image colorée sur celui-ci | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.06.1992 | IT | 10.06.1992 | NL | 10.06.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.06.1992 | |
NL | 10.06.1992 | ||
FR | 30.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | NL | 10.06.1992 | |
FR | 30.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | NL | 10.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5833238 ; | [Y]SU193923 ; | [A]JP59204041 ; | [Y]EP0163314 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]DD231664 (WOLFEN FILMFAB VEB [DD]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 113 (P-197)[1258], 18th May 1983; & JP-A-58 33 238 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 26-02-1983, & JP5833238 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 68, no. 18, 1968, page 8003, abstract no. 83108u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-193 923 (ALL-UNION SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH CINEMA-PHOTOGRAPHIC INSTITUTE AND SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF ORGANIC INTERMEDIATES AND DYES) 13-03-1967, & SU193923 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 143 (P-459)[2200], 27th May 1986; & JP-A-59 204 041 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 19-11-1984, & JP59204041 A 00000000 |