Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0264934 | Global Dossier | 16.06.1993 | B1 | EP0264934 | 29.03.1989 | A3 | EP0264934 | 27.04.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP25138186 | 22.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3786224T | 21.10.1993 | T2 | DE3786224D1 | 22.07.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP25138186 | 22.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2604362B | 30.04.1997 | B2 | JPS63105285 | 10.05.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25138186 | 22.10.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4810168 | 07.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25138186 | 22.10.1986 |