EP0264934 - Low pulsation pump device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nogami, Taro 1380-5, Tabiko Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Nishitarumizu, Tsuyoshi Akebonoryo 663, Ichige Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Seki, Kiwao Tsukubadai Apartment 6-108 663, Ichige Katsuta-shi / JP | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/17] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115449.8 | 21.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | JP19860251381 | 22.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25138186 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264934 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264934 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264934 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04B11/00 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
F04B11/00 (EP,US);
F04B11/0058 (EP,US);
F04B11/0083 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/17] |
Former [1988/17] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Pumpvorrichtung mit niedriger Pulsation | [1988/17] | English: | Low pulsation pump device | [1988/17] | French: | Dispositif de pompage à basse pulsation | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 16.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4359312 (FUNKE HERBERT, et al); | [Y]US4137011 (ROCK JOHN V); | [A]US4352636 (PATTERSON WILLIAMS G, et al) |