EP0265838 - Forgery-proof code card reader system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/18] | Forgery-proof code card reader | ||
[1992/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interflex Datensysteme GmbH Postfach 81 03 60 D-70520 Stuttgart / DE | [1988/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Werner Lindenweg 3 CH-5453 Remetschwil / CH | 02 /
Schuhwerk, Anton Scheibenbuckstrasse 18 CH-7716 Geisingen 5 / DE | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Otte, Peter Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Mollenbachstrasse 37 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115473.8 | 22.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | DE19863636921 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3636921 | [1988/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0265838 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0265838 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265838 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/08, G06K7/12, G06K7/14 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
G06K19/06028 (EP,US);
G06K19/14 (EP,US);
G06K7/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/18] | G06K19/08, G06K7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Fälschungssicheres Code-Kartenlesersystem | [1992/13] | English: | Forgery-proof code card reader system | [1992/13] | French: | Système pour lecteur de carte à code infalsifiable | [1992/13] |
Former [1988/18] | Fälschungssicherer Code-Kartenleser | ||
Former [1988/18] | Forgery-proof code card reader | ||
Former [1988/18] | Lecteur de carte à code infalsifiable | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 11.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.12.1992 | SE | 16.12.1992 | ES | 27.03.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 16.12.1992 | |
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/29] | SE | 16.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2192738 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [Y]US3919447 (KILMER JR CHARLIE C, et al) |