EP0269836 - Mounting of a sealing boot on a ball joint housing, and mounting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Ehrenreich GmbH & Co. KG Hansa-Allee 190 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states TRW Ehrenreich GmbH & Co. KG Hansa-Allee 190 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schütt, Hans Joachim Annastrasse 26 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Mette, Ulrich Burgstrasse 9 D-4300 Essen / DE | 03 /
Barbet, Karl-Heinz Novalisstrasse 4 D-4052 Korschenbroich / DE | 04 /
Busse, Fritz Ludwig-Richter-Weg 29 D-4010 Hilden / DE | 05 /
Blumberg, Willy Am Eisenbrand 20 D-4005 Meerbusch / DE | 06 /
Klier, Benno Weberstrasse 2 D-4005 Meerbusch / DE | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115559.4 | 23.10.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863641030 | 01.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3641030 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269836 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269836 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269836 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
B62D7/16 (EP,US);
F16C11/0671 (EP,US);
F16C2326/24 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49934 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32721 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32729 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32778 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/23] | Title | German: | Befestigung und Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Dichtungsbalges am Gelenkgehäuse eines Kugelgelenkes | [1988/23] | English: | Mounting of a sealing boot on a ball joint housing, and mounting device | [1988/23] | French: | Fixation et dispositif pour la fixation d'un soufflet d'étanchéité au carter d'un joint à rotule | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2935003 [ ] (EHRENREICH GMBH & CO KG A); | US3175834 [ ] (WALLACE LESLIE M, et al); | US2559857 [ ] (EDWARDS ARTHUR H) | Examination | GB973995 | EP0144590 | DE1525083 | DE1266573 |