EP0265874 - Method of producing human prourokinase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi-1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amatsuji, Yasuo 6-2, Nagao Motomachi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Okabayashi, Ken 1-6-24, Kuzuha Asahi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Nagai, Masanori 10-10, Nishiyama Waki Yahata-shi Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Arimura, Hirofumi 18-1-401, Uenosaka 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 05 /
Suyama, Tadakazu 3-7, Matsuigaoka 4-chome Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto / JP | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/18] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115600.6 | 23.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | JP19860253078 | 23.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25307886 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0265874 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0265874 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N9/72 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
C12N15/00 (KR);
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12N9/6462 (EP);
C12Y304/21073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung menschlicher Prourokinase | [1988/18] | English: | Method of producing human prourokinase | [1988/18] | French: | Méthode de production de pro-urokinase humaine | [1988/18] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/30] | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0154272 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]); | [YD]EP0117060 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [A]EP0117059 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [Y]EP0092182 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [Y]EP0191606 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [A]EP0159714 (ISRAEL BIO ENG PROJECT [US]) | [XP] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY |