EP0269851 - Aluminium or aluminium alloy based carrier materials for offset printing plates, and process for manufacturing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenk, Michael Weinbergstrasse 2a D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Ernst, Renate Albert-Schweitzer-Allee 39 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1993/23] |
Former [1988/23] | 01 /
Brenk, Michael, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Weinbergstrasse 2a D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
Ernst, Renate, Chem. Albert-Schweitzer-Allee 39 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115715.2 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863637764 | 06.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3637764 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269851 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269851 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269851 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41N1/08, C25D11/04, C23F1/02, C25F3/04 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
C25D11/08 (EP,US);
B41N3/034 (EP,US);
Y10S205/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/30] |
Former [1988/23] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Trägermaterial auf der Basis von Aluminium oder dessen Legierungen für Offsetdruckplatten sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1993/23] | English: | Aluminium or aluminium alloy based carrier materials for offset printing plates, and process for manufacturing them | [1988/23] | French: | Support en aluminium ou en alliage d'aluminium pour des plaques offset et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/23] |
Former [1988/23] | Trägermaterial auf der basis von Aluminium oder dessen Legierungen für Offsetdruckplatten sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | Examination procedure | 13.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1222714 ; | [A]US4166777 (CASSON EDWARD A JR [US], et al); | [A]US4188270 (KATAOKA AKIYOSHI [JP]) | [A] - GALVANOTECHNIK, Band 78, Nr. 7, Juli 1987, Seite 1963, Saulgau (Württ.) DE; & SU-A-1 222 714, & SU1222714 A 00000000 |