EP0266664 - Structure of gland packing box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Takahisa 5-10, Mukogaoka 4-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Sasakura, Hiroyuki 11-15, Mukogaoka 4-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Takashi 15-9, Hazamagaoka 2-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus-Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115776.4 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | JP19860266469 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26646986 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266664 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266664 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266664 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/18 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
F16J15/182 (EP,US);
F04D29/08 (KR);
F16J15/162 (EP,US);
F16J15/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/19] | Title | German: | Anordnung von einem Stopfbüchsengehäuse | [1988/19] | English: | Structure of gland packing box | [1988/19] | French: | Disposition d'un boîtier pour presse-étoupes | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 29.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR739797 ; | [A]DE903878 (IAWESERIA AG); | [A]FR1200245 ; | [A]FR2103056 (MASCH & WERKZEUGBAU GMBH); | [X]GB2139299 (COAL IND); | [X]GB2166814 (NL INDUSTRIES INC) |