EP0266720 - Plastic pipe, method and device for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMETEX AG Eternitstrasse 3 CH-8867 Niederurnen / CH | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keldany, Rachid Im Aeglisten 3 CH-8124 Maur / DE | 02 /
Shaw, Keith James Leutschenstrasse 29 CH-8807 Freienbach / DE | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 87116076.8 | 02.11.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | CH19860004441 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: CH 444186 | [1988/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266720 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266720 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/16, B29C53/78, F16L11/00, B29C53/58 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
F16L11/16 (EP);
B29D23/00 (KR);
B29C53/78 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/19] | F16L11/00, F16L11/16, B29C53/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | Kunststoffrohr, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [1988/19] | English: | Plastic pipe, method and device for manufacturing the same | [1988/19] | French: | Tuyau en matière plastique, méthode et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1988/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/14] | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.1990 | 02.12.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | FR | Licencee: | S.A. ETERNIT INDUSTRIES Rue de l'Amandier 78540 Vernouillet / FR | Date: | 25.07.1990 |
Former [1990/37] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | FR | ||
Licencee: | S.A. ETERNIT INDUSTRIES Rue de l'Amandier 78540 Vernouillet / FR | ||
Date: | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1281757 ; | [A]US2739089 (HENRIK HAGELTORN BROR); | [A]GB1041170 (LUFTKONDITIONERING AB); | [X]EP0001894 (RIB LOC HONG KONG); | [A]US4337564 (MENZEL STANLEY W O, et al); | [A]EP0114613 (BURCHER FRIEDRICH); | [E]WO8800129 (RIB LOC AUSTRALIA [AU]) |