EP0274588 - Modular-structure equipment for the automatic and integral cleaning of the toilet bowl, for use both in public and private toilets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.T. MATIC S.p.A. Via Elba, 5 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states P.T. MATIC S.p.A. Via Elba, 5 I-20144 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghellini Sargenti, Ennio c/o P.T.MATIC S.p.A. Via Elba, 5 I-20144 Milano MI / IT | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Piazza Bernini, 6 I-20133 Milano (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 87116195.6 | 04.11.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | IT19860022728 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: IT 2272886 | [1988/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274588 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274588 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00, A47K13/30 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
A47K13/302 (EP);
E03D9/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Modulvorrichtung zum automatischen und integralen Reinigen eines Toilettenbeckens zum Benützen in öffentlichen und privaten Toiletten | [1988/29] | English: | Modular-structure equipment for the automatic and integral cleaning of the toilet bowl, for use both in public and private toilets | [1988/29] | French: | Equipement en structure modulaire pour nettoyer automatiquement et intégralement une cuvette de W.C., utilisable dans les toilettes publiques et privées | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1877689 [ ] (PETERSON ROBERT E); | DE2907754 [ ] (GERTRUD STOCKBURGER FA); | FR2580310 [ ] (NELVA PASQUAL YVES [FR]) |