EP0268163 - Sowing and cultivating method and tool combination for the application of this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlüter-Craes, Franz, Dr. Am Brink 9 D-4783 Anröchte-Berge / DE | [1988/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116395.2 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | DE19863638603 | 12.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3638603 | [1988/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268163 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268163 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01B49/06 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
A01B49/06 (EP);
A01C7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/21] | Title | German: | Bestellsaatverfahren und Gerätekombination zur Durchführung eines Bestellsaatverfahrens | [1988/21] | English: | Sowing and cultivating method and tool combination for the application of this method | [1988/21] | French: | Méthode de semis et culture et combinaison d'outils pour l'exécution de cette méthode | [1988/21] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.10.1990 | IT | 24.10.1990 | CH | 30.11.1990 | LI | 30.11.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/01] | BE | 24.10.1990 | |
CH | 30.11.1990 | ||
LI | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/38] | BE | 24.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2302010 (BONNEL HENRI [FR]); | [A]US4432292 (SCOTT KENNETH G [US]); | [A]FR2124063 (LOTHON RENE [FR]); | [A]EP0075133 (VON BREMEN OLTMANN); | [A]DE8222674U ; | [AD]GB1094681 (DOXAMS LTD, et al); | [A]FR2032019 (LOTHON RENE, et al) |