EP0266793 - Rear converter for interchangeable lens camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 36-9, Maeno-cho 2-Chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 36-9, Maeno-cho 2-Chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Masahiro c/o Asahi Kogaku Kogyo K. K. No. 36-9, Maeno-cho 2-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Osamu c/o Asahi Kogaku Kogyo K. K. No. 36-9, Maeno-cho 2-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116427.3 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | JP19860262676 | 06.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26267686 | JP19860262677 | 06.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26267786 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266793 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266793 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266793 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03B19/07 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
G03B17/14 (EP,US);
G03B19/07 (KR);
G02B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | Adapter für Kameras mit austauschbarem Objektiv | [1988/19] | English: | Rear converter for interchangeable lens camera | [1988/19] | French: | Adaptateur pour les caméras à objectif interchangeable | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 22.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS59162531 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [AD]JPS61234141 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [AD]JPS604916 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK); | [A]DE2536075 (ROLLEI WERKE FRANKE HEIDECKE); | [A]US4571630 (TAMAGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) | Examination | US4572638 |