EP0283567 - Distance element for tubular lamp fixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ringwald, Egon Guetrütiweg 12 CH-6010 Kriens / CH | 02 /
Arato, Laszlo Fischmattstrasse 6 CH-6374 Buochs / CH | [1988/39] | Application number, filing date | 87116490.1 | 09.11.1987 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | CH19870001065 | 20.03.1987 Original published format: CH 106587 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283567 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283567 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283567 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F21V19/00 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
F21V19/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/39] | Title | German: | Distanzstück für Leuchten mit rohrförmigen Lampen | [1988/39] | English: | Distance element for tubular lamp fixture | [1988/39] | French: | Pièce d'écartement pour armature à lampe tubulaire | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH347264 (BUSCH JAEGER DUERENER METALL [DE]); | [A]FR1347017 (RAPID SA); | [A]US3176260 (PASCUCCI ERNEST B); | [A]FR2016439 (VOSSLOH WERKE GMBH) |