Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
19.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] |
15.12.1988 | Change - representative | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
08.06.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] |
14.05.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] |