EP0268215 - Inclusion complex of ibuproxam with beta-cyclodextrin, a process for preparing the same and a pharmaceutical preparation containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEK, tovarna farmacevtskih in kemicnih izdelkov, d.d. Verovskova 57 SI-61107 Ljubljana / SI | [1993/20] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states LEK, tovarna farmacevtskih in kemicnih izdelkov, n.sol.o. Verovskova 57 SI-61107 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zmitek, Janko Poklukarjeva 6 YU-61000 Ljubljana / YU | 02 /
Milovac, Jenny Gotska 13 YU-61000 Ljubljana / YU | 03 /
Kopitar, Zdravko Muljava 7 YU-61234 Menges / YU | 04 /
Zorz, Mirjam Topniska 30 YU-61000 Ljubljana / YU | 05 /
Rusjakovski, Boris Linhartova 96 YU-61000 Ljubljana / YU | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116738.3 | 12.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | YU19860001932 | 13.11.1986 Original published format: YU 193286 | [1988/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268215 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268215 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/16, A61K31/735 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/21] | Title | German: | Inklusionskomplex von Ibuproxam mit beta-Cyclodextrin, Verfahren zur Herstellung und diesen Inklusionskomplex enthaltendes pharmazeutisches Präparat | [1988/21] | English: | Inclusion complex of ibuproxam with beta-cyclodextrin, a process for preparing the same and a pharmaceutical preparation containing the same | [1988/21] | French: | Complexe d'inclusion de bêta-cyclodextrine avec l'ibuproxame, procédé de préparation et composition pharmaceutique contenant ce complexe | [1988/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.10.1993 | CH | 06.10.1993 | DE | 06.10.1993 | FR | 06.10.1993 | IT | 06.10.1993 | LI | 06.10.1993 | NL | 06.10.1993 | GB | 06.01.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.01.1994 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.01.1994 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
DE | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2213062 (MANETTI & ROBERTS ITALO BRIT [IT]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CYCLODEXTRINS, Budapest, 30th September - 2nd October 1981, pages 377-380,387, D. Reidel Publishing Co., Dordrecht, NL; A. STADLER-SZOKE et al.: "A forecast for application of cyclodextrins in the pharma-industry" | Examination | DE2902297 | - Chemical & Pharmaceutical Bulletin, vol. 26, no. 10, Otober 1978, p. 2952 ; | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 94, 1981, p. 760. abstract 84448d | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 95, 1981, p. 382, abstract 156580m | - "Chem.Pharm Bull., vol 26, no 10, 1978, pp.2952-2956 | - DE PS-2902297. | - "International Journal of Pharmaceutics, vol. 28,,1986, pp. 95-101 |