EP0274025 - Novel antiviral agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park California 94025-3493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025-3493 / US | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reist, Elmer Joseph 581 Berkeley Avenue Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 02 /
Sturm, Priscilla Anna 1549 Montalvo Drive Mountain View California 94040 / US | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Santarelli, Marc Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Santarelli, Marc Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87116867.0 | 14.05.1984 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | US19830497720 | 24.05.1983 Original published format: US 497720 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274025 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274025 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/65, C07H19/16, A61K31/70 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
C07H19/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
C07F9/65586 (EP);
C07F9/65616 (EP);
C07H19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1988/28] | Title | German: | Antivirale Wirkstoffe | [1988/28] | English: | Novel antiviral agents | [1988/28] | French: | Agents antiviraux | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/08] | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84902178.7 / EP0145739 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3446793 (JONES GORDON H, et al); | [X]DE2009834 ; | [X]US3560478 (MYERS TERRELL C); | [X]GB1243213 (SYNTEX CORP [PA]); | [X]FR2381781 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]EP0049072 (ENS BIO LOGICALS INC [CA]); | [X]EP0074306 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. XI, February, April, June 1974, pages 211-218; J.A. MONTGOMERY et al.: "The use of the wittig reaction in the modification of purine nucleosides (1)" | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 92, no. 18, 9th September 1970, pages 5510-5511; G.H. JONES: "Communications to the editor. Synthesis of isosteric phosphonate analogs of some biologically important phosphodiesters" | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 90, no. 19, 11th September 1968, pages 5337-5338; G.H. JONES et al.: "The synthesis of 6'-Deoxyhomonucleoside-6'- phosphonic acids" | [X] - LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, vol. 1, 1984, pages 98-107, Verlag Chemie, Weinheim, DE; J. HOLLMANN et al.: "Darstellung und Konformationszuordnung einiger 5'-homologer Adenosinderivate" | [X] - CHEMICAL REVIEW, vol. 77, no. 3, June 1977, pages 349-367; R. ENGEL: "Phosphonates as analogues of natural phosphates" | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 12, no. 9, 24th April 1973, pages 1730-1736; A. HAMPTON et al.: "Synthesis of homoadenosine-6'-phosphonic acid and studies of its substrate and inhibitor properties with adenosine monophosphate utilizing enzymes" |