EP0269952 - Fault-tolerant ring power supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEB Elektroprojekt und Anlagenbau Berlin Rhinstrasse 100 DDR-1140 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states VEB Elektroprojekt und Anlagenbau Berlin Rhinstrasse 100 DDR-1140 Berlin / DD | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states VEB Geräte- und Regler-Werk Leipzig Baalsdorfer Strasse 55 DDR-7027 Leipzig / DD | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohbeck, Volker Sachsenstrasse 9 DD-7050 Leipzig / DD | 02 /
Burkhardt, Ralf Manetstrasse 2 DD-7010 Leipzig / DD | 03 /
Gibas, Peter, Dr. Schirmerstrasse 1 DD-7050 Leipzig / DD | 04 /
Kriesel, Werner, Prof. Dr. sc. phil. Rödelstrasse 5 DD-7031 Leipzig / DD | 05 /
Jeckel, Uwe Hoferstrasse 5 DD-7050 Leipzig / DD | 06 /
Steinbock, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Arthur-Hoffmann-Strasse 4 DD-7010 Leipzig / DD | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/23] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117072.6 | 19.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DD19130002966 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: DD 296613 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269952 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269952 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/26, H02H7/28 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
H02H7/262 (EP);
H02H7/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/23] | Title | German: | Fehlertolerantes ringförmiges Stromversorgungssystem | [1988/23] | English: | Fault-tolerant ring power supply system | [1988/23] | French: | Système d'alimentation de courant tolérant des défauts, de forme annulaire | [1988/23] | File destroyed: | 26.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 15.11.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH609487 ; | [AD]FR2292362 ; | [AD]FR2905757 |