EP0276401 - Mechanically operated pressure switch having solid state components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kierstead, Bruce E. 36 Kingswood Drive Hendersonville North Carolina 28739 / US | 02 /
Noth, Myron A. 8 Cherry Lane Ashville North Carolina 28804 / US | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117162.5 | 11.07.1984 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | US19830512492 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: US 512492 | US19830512493 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: US 512493 | US19830512494 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: US 512494 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276401 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276401 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H35/24, H02H7/08 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
H02H7/08 (EP);
H01H35/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Mechanisch betätigter Druckschalter mit Festkörperbauelementen | [1988/31] | English: | Mechanically operated pressure switch having solid state components | [1988/31] | French: | Automate manométrique à actionnement mécanique ayant des composants à l'état solide | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/31] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84902877.4 / EP0148941 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 26.08.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.1988 | 31.07.1989 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.1989 | 31.07.1991 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1494202 ; | [YD]US3340372 ; | [Y]FR1355293 ; | [A]US3466978 ; | [A]US4370098 ; | [A]EP0027843 ; | [A]FR1556653 ; | [AD]US4020308 | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS vol. IA-14, no. 1, January 1978, NEW YORK page 27 - 32; A.A.REGOTTI: "GROUNDING AND RELAYING FOR PIPELINE PUMPMOTOR PROTECTION" |