Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
11.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] |
12.09.1991 | First examination report | |
17.10.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] |
20.02.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 12.04.1989 [1989/15] |
18.06.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] |