EP0269037 - Overvoltage protection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBO Bettermann OHG Hüingser Ring 52 58710 Menden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states OBO Bettermann OHG Hüingser Ring 52 D-58710 Menden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jordan, Ernst-Günther Oberm Rohlande 98 D-5750 Menden 2 / DE | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 D-58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117192.2 | 21.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | DE19863640402 | 26.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3640402 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269037 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269037 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/68, H01R13/66, H01Q1/50 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/68 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | H01R13/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/22] | Title | German: | Überspannungsschutzgerät | [1988/22] | English: | Overvoltage protection apparatus | [1988/22] | French: | Appareil de protection contre les surtensions | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/46] | 25.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.04.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3404994 ; | [A]EP0061652 ; | [AD]DE3513230 |