blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0269045

EP0269045 - Process for preparing etherifed 3-hydroxy valeric acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.1992 [1992/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/22]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Rolf, Dr.
Bergstrasse 98
D-6900 Heidelberg / DE
[1988/22]
Application number, filing date87117212.823.11.1987
[1988/22]
Priority number, dateDE1986364059527.11.1986         Original published format: DE 3640595
[1988/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0269045
Date:01.06.1988
Language:DE
[1988/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0269045
Date:15.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0269045
Date:02.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.1989
ClassificationIPC:C07C67/31, C07C69/708, C07C69/712
[1988/22]
CPC:
C07C69/708 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1988/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von veretherten 3-Hydroxyvaleriansäureestern[1988/22]
English:Process for preparing etherifed 3-hydroxy valeric acid esters[1988/22]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'esters d'acide 3-hydroxyvalérique éthérifié[1988/22]
Examination procedure09.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/16]
20.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.06.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.06.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1991Fee for grant paid
30.07.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]  - ARKIV FÖR KEMI Band 12, Nr. 25, 1958, Seiten 239-246, SALO GRONOWITZ: " 3-Substituted thiophenes Preparation and metalation of 3-methoxythiophene"
Examination   - J.ORG.CHEMISTRY 47,(1982), S. 2745-2748
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.