EP0270904 - Process for the preparation of quinoloncarboxylate esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preiss, Michael, Dr. Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 12 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1988/24] | Application number, filing date | 87117281.3 | 24.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | DE19863641661 | 05.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3641661 | [1988/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0270904 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0270904 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/56, C07D471/04, C07D498/06, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D498/06, 265:00, 221:00) | [1988/24] | CPC: |
C07D215/56 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D455/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Chinoloncarbonsäureestern | [1988/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of quinoloncarboxylate esters | [1988/24] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'esters d'acides quinolonecarboxyliques | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 10.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/10] | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0131839 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [XD] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 50, Nr. 5, 8. März 1985, Seiten 560-565, American Chemical Society; S. KIM et al.: "A simple and mild esterification method for carboxylic acids using mixed carboxylic-carbonic anhydrides" | [A] - A.R. KATRITZKY et al.: "Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry", Band 17, 1974, Seite 313, Academic Press |