EP0273201 - Rapid heating apparatus for blood and blood products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicolas Marchiani Chatelain, Marie-Louise Le Lesdiguière Résidence St. Mury F-38240 Meylan / FR | For all designated states Pellini, Jean-Pierre Tèche 38470 Vinay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states Nicolas Marchiani Chatelain, Marie-Louise Le Lesdiguière Résidence St. Mury F-38240 Meylan / FR | ||
For all designated states Pellini, Jean-Pierre Tèche F-38470 Vinay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/27] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-8000 Munich 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117391.0 | 25.11.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | FR19860016859 | 28.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8616859 | [1988/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273201 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273201 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, A61M1/36, A61K35/14 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/445 (EP,US);
A61M2205/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum schnellen Anwärmen von Blut und Blutprodukten | [1988/27] | English: | Rapid heating apparatus for blood and blood products | [1988/27] | French: | Réchauffeur rapide pour sang et produits sanguins | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1991 | GB | 17.04.1991 | GR | 17.04.1991 | IT | 17.04.1991 | NL | 17.04.1991 | SE | 17.04.1991 | ES | 28.07.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
GB | 17.04.1991 | ||
GR | 17.04.1991 | ||
IT | 17.04.1991 | ||
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
ES | 28.07.1991 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
GB | 17.04.1991 | ||
GR | 17.04.1991 | ||
IT | 17.04.1991 | ||
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
GB | 17.04.1991 | ||
IT | 17.04.1991 | ||
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
GB | 17.04.1991 | ||
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/48] | SE | 17.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1140895 ; | [A]US3064649 (LEE FUSON ROBERT); | [A]DE2515889 (ENGEL JOACHIM MICHAEL); | [Y]DE3502095 (ZEIPEL KURT) |