EP0270971 - Substituted benzamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-5090 Leverkusen 1 Bayerwerk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gayer, Herbert, Dr. Alfred-Delp-Strasse 4 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Jelich, Klaus, Dr. Pahlkestrasse 5 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Krämer, Wolfgang, Dr. Rosenkranz 25 D-5093 Burscheid 2 / DE | 04 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | [1988/24] | Application number, filing date | 87117669.9 | 30.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | DE19863642450 | 12.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3642450 | [1988/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0270971 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0270971 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C131/00, C07C121/457, C07C153/05, C07D307/52, C07D231/12, A01N37/20, A01N47/40 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A01N37/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/08 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/24] | C07C131/00, C07C121/457, C07C153/05, C07D307/52, C07D231/12, A01N47/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Substituierte Benzamide | [1988/24] | English: | Substituted benzamides | [1988/24] | French: | Benzamides substitués | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 28.08.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1934443 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM); | [A]US3829464 (KORNIS G, et al); | [AD]EP0135304 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0156773 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0059536 |