EP0274055 - Large passband information and/or instruction transmission device between a mobile unit and a supervision station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states ALSTHOM 38, avenue Kléber F-75784 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heddebaut, Marc 58 rue du Maréchal Leclerc F-59262 Sainghin en Melantois / FR | 02 /
Degauque, Pierre 38 rue André Messager F-59130 Lambersart / FR | 03 /
Duhot, Denis 62 rue Tiquetonne F-75002 Paris / FR | 04 /
Mainardi, Pierre 16 rue la Cuisine Douvrin F-62138 Haisnes / FR | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117673.1 | 30.11.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | FR19860017425 | 12.12.1986 Original published format: FR 8617425 | FR19870003734 | 18.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8703734 | [1988/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274055 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274055 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274055 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/22, G08G1/09, H01Q1/32, H04B5/00 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
B61L3/227 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Nachrichten- und/oder Befehlsübertragungsvorrichtung mit breitbandigem Durchlassband zwischen einem Mobil-Element und einer Überwachungsstelle | [1988/28] | English: | Large passband information and/or instruction transmission device between a mobile unit and a supervision station | [1988/28] | French: | Dispositif de transmission d'informations et/ou d'instructions à large bande passante entre un élément mobile et un poste de contrôle | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Request for further processing for: | 17.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1531311 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]FR1549793 ; | [Y]US3729740 (NAKAHARA T, et al); | [A]US3766378 (BABA T, et al); | [Y]GB2010049 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]US4338587 (CHIAPPETTI ARTHUR B) | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR COMMUNICATIONS, vol. VC-13, no. 1, septembre 1964, pages 1-18, New York, US; T. KAWAKAMI et al.: "Waveguide communication system for centralized railway traffic control" |