EP0274642 - Herbicidal and fungicidal agents based on substituted pyrazolin-5-one derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-5090 Leverkusen 1 Bayerwerk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehring, Reinhold, Dr. Dasnöckel 49 D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | 02 /
Lindig, Markus, Dr. Dahlienweg 16 D-4010 Hilden / DE | 03 /
Wroblowsky, Heinz-Jürgen, Dr. Gladbacher Strasse 34 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
Santel, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Grünstrasse 9a D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 05 /
Schmidt, Robert R., Dr. Im Waldwinkel 110 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 06 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 07 /
Strang, Robert Harry, Dr. Unterdorfstrasse 6A D-4000 Düsseldorf 31 / DE | [1988/29] | Application number, filing date | 87117732.5 | 01.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863643148 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643148 | DE19873728278 | 25.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3728278 | [1988/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274642 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274642 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274642 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/22, C07D231/24, C07D231/26, C07D231/32, C07D231/52, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D409/04, C07D409/06, C07D417/04, // C07C243/22 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N47/02 (EP,US);
C07D231/22 (EP,US);
C07D231/24 (EP,US);
C07D231/26 (EP,US);
C07D231/30 (EP,US);
C07D231/32 (EP,US);
C07D231/44 (EP,US);
C07D231/52 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/29] | C07D231/22, C07D231/24, C07D231/26, C07D231/32, C07D231/52, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D409/04, C07D409/06, C07D417/04, // C07C109/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/29] | Title | German: | Herbizide und fungizide Mittel auf Basis von substituierten Pyrazolin-5-on-Derivaten | [1988/29] | English: | Herbicidal and fungicidal agents based on substituted pyrazolin-5-one derivatives | [1988/29] | French: | Agents herbicides et fongicides à base de dérivés de pyrazolin-5-one substitués | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.1993 | [1995/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB887509 (BAYER AG); | [X]FR2081595 (SERDEX); | [X]DE2511354 (SANDOZ AG); | [X]DD123464 ; | [XD]EP0020299 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0022078 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]EP0115469 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [XD] - ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, Band 318, Nr. 1, 1985, Seiten 89-91; A. KREUTZBERGER et al.: "Die Aminomethinylierung im System der 1-(Alkylphenyl)-2-pyrazolin-5-one" | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 38, Nr. 8, August 1916, Seiten 1510-1517; F.B. DAINS et al.: "On the reactions of the formamidines. V. On some pyrazolone derivatives" | [X] - GAZETTA CHIMICA ITALIANA, Band 77, 1947, Seiten 3-12; M. RIDI: "Sintesi di derivati dell'aldeide antipirinica"; & BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, E 3/4, Band 25, Teil 5, 1982, Seite 3732 | [X] - ANNALI DI CHIMICA, Band 43, Nr. 12, November-Dezember 1953, Seiten 816-826; M. RIDI et al.: "Nuovi derivati antipirinici, isoantipirinici, pirazolidinici"; & BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, E 3/4, Band 25, Teil 5, 1982, Seite 3733 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 55, Nr. 2, 23. Januar 1961, Spalten 1583g-1584c, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.M. ZUBAROVSKII et al.: "Synthesis of thiazole derivatives. XV. Benzothiazolylpyrazolones"; & ZHUR. OBSHCHEI KHIM. 1960, (30), Pages 1585-1590 | [XD] - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, Band 34, 1981, Seiten 1117-1124; J.E. ROCKLEY et al.: "Structure of 5-methyl-4[(arylamino)-methylene]-2,4-dihydro-3H-pyrazol-3-ones" | [X] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 23, Nr. 3, Mai-Juni 1986, Seiten 781-784; A. KREUTZBERGER et al.: "Antibakterielle Wirkstoffe. IX [1]. Die Aminomethinylierung im System des 3-Methyl-1-(4-nitrophenyl)-2-pyrazolin-5-ons" | [AD] - ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, Band 319, Nr. 10, 1986, Seiten 865-871; A. KREUTZBERGER et al.: "1-(4-Chlorphenyl)-2-pyrazolin-5-on-Derivate" | [AD] - ZURNAL ORGANICESKOG CHIMII, Band 13, Nr. 4, 1977, Seiten 863-868; L.V. ALAM et al.: "Complexes with organic ligands. II. Bromination of chelate compounds based on aminomethylene derivatives of some five-membered heterocycles"; & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 87, Nr. 2, 11. Juli 1977, Seite 648, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung Nr. 15257j | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 61, Nr. 12, 7. Dezember 1964, Spalten 14659e-14660a, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.A. PORAI-KOSHITS et al.: "Chemical transformations of N,N-disubstituted aminomethylene derivatives of pyrazolone and rhodanine"; & ZH. OBSHCH. KHIM. 1964, 34(9), Pages 2999-3005 | [A] - INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, Band 7, Nr. 10, 1969, Seiten 1006-1009; M.R. CHANDRAMOHAN et al.: "Studies on the application of Vilsmeier-Haack reaction to lactams: Part III. Reaction with lactams containing an additional hetero atom" |