EP0307512 - Digital data slicing circuit for teletext signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweer, Rainer, Dr. Ing. Lärchenweg 14 D-7808 Waldkirch / DE | 02 /
Jünke, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Blumenstrasse 6 D-7803 Gundelfingen / DE | 03 /
Sieben, Ulrich K. Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Kronengasse 7 D-7801 Reute / DE | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/19] |
Former [1989/12] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117884.4 | 03.12.1987 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | EP19870113085 | 08.09.1987 Original published format: EP 87113085 | [1989/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307512 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307512 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
H04N7/0355 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1989/12] | Title | German: | Digitale Daten-Slicer-Schaltung für Teletextsignale | [1989/12] | English: | Digital data slicing circuit for teletext signals | [1989/12] | French: | Circuit découpeur de données numériques pour des signaux de télétexte | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0144457 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE], et al); | [A]GB2164812 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0016503 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) |