EP0273231 - Regulating device, in particular for an ammoniac converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbort, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Unnaer Strasse 65b D-5758 Fröndenberg / DE | 02 /
Graeve, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Bittermarkstrasse 33a D-4600 Dortmund 50 / DE | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117925.5 | 04.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | DE19863643856 | 22.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643856 | [1988/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273231 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273231 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273231 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01C1/04, B01J8/04 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
C01C1/0423 (EP);
B01J8/0415 (EP);
B01J8/0496 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/27] | B01J8/04, C01C1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Regeln insbesondere eines Ammoniakkonverters | [1988/27] | English: | Regulating device, in particular for an ammoniac converter | [1988/27] | French: | Dispositif de régulation, en particulier d'un convertisseur d'ammoniac | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 02.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3224422 (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH]); | [A]EP0114138 (AZOTE & PROD CHIM [FR]) |