EP0271787 - Personal-protection radio apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selectronic Funk- und Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Panroder Strasse D-65510 Hünstetten / DE | [1988/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ormanns, Siegfried Münchner Strasse 39 D-4650 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Schwalb, Hans Joachim Lökensweg 16 D-4390 Gladbeck / DE | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1988/25] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118001.4 | 05.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | DE19863643236 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643236 | [1988/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271787 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271787 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271787 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
A43B3/00 (EP,US);
G08B21/02 (EP,US);
A43B3/38 (EP,US);
A43B3/42 (EP,US);
A43B3/48 (EP,US);
A43B3/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Personenschutzfunkgerät | [1988/25] | English: | Personal-protection radio apparatus | [1988/25] | French: | Appareil radio à protection de personnel | [1988/25] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.01.1994 | GR | 05.01.1994 | IT | 05.01.1994 | NL | 05.01.1994 | SE | 05.01.1994 | ES | 16.04.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
GR | 05.01.1994 | ||
IT | 05.01.1994 | ||
NL | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
IT | 05.01.1994 | ||
NL | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1997/17] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
NL | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
NL | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/44] | SE | 05.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58103015 ; | [A]DE1027143 (KIENINGER & OBERGFELL); | [Y]FR1555306 ; | [A]FR1583845 ; | [A]EP0093463 (GIVATY MICHAEL [NL], et al) |