EP0279046 - Anchoring nut for a shuttering anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hünnebeck-RöRo Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Am Zechenplatz 1 40885 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states Hünnebeck-RöRo Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Am Zechenplatz 1 D-40885 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states Hünnebeck GmbH Am Zechenplatz D-4030 Ratingen 4 - Lintorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagemes, Klaus Rheinstrasse 176d D-4060 Viersen 12 / DE | 02 /
Schliephacke, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Württembergstrasse 18 D-4030 Ratingen 6-Hösel / DE | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118102.0 | 08.12.1987 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | DE19873704646 | 14.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704646 | [1988/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0279046 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0279046 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04G17/06, F16B43/00 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
E04G17/065 (EP);
F16B43/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Ankermutter für Schalungsanker | [1988/34] | English: | Anchoring nut for a shuttering anchor | [1988/34] | French: | Ecrou d'ancrage pour tirant de coffrage | [1988/34] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 05.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2011358 ; | [Y]FR2580744 ; | [Y]EP0195868 |