EP0271103 - Device for measuring the distribution of forces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brunner, Wolfgang brunner & zech Postfach 1143 D-88305 Isny / DE | For all designated states von Zech, Ludwig brunner & zech&Postfach 1143 D-88316 Isny / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Brunner, Wolfgang brunner & zech Postfach 1143 D-88305 Isny / DE | ||
For all designated states von Zech, Ludwig brunner & zech&Postfach 1143 D-88316 Isny / DE | |||
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states Brunner, Wolfgang Ringenberg 175 D-88167 Maierhöfen / DE | ||
For all designated states von Zech, Ludwig brunner & zech&Postfach 1143 D-88316 Isny / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1989/49] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/24] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118330.7 | 10.12.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | DE19863642088 | 10.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3642088 | [1988/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271103 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271103 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
G01L1/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/22] |
Former [1988/36] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | ||
Former [1988/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Messung von Kraftverteilungen | [1988/24] | English: | Device for measuring the distribution of forces | [1988/24] | French: | Dispositif pour la mesure de répartition des forces | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, GR, LU, NL | 30.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 27.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.01.1988 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 10.01.1988 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 10.01.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 10.01.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 10.01.1988 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0128292 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [YD]DE3025362 (NICOL KLAUS, et al); | [YD]DE2529475 (NICOL KLAUS DR) |