EP0272553 - Method for preparing ethylene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1988/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomotsu, Norio Idemitsu Petrochemical Co. Ltd. 1-1 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118332.3 | 10.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | JP19860292462 | 10.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29246286 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272553 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272553 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272553 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/025 (US,EP);
C08F10/02, C08F4/69 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/05] |
Former [1988/26] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Äthylenpolymeren | [1993/18] | English: | Method for preparing ethylene polymers | [1988/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polymères de l'éthylène | [1988/26] |
Former [1988/26] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Äthylenpolymerisation | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2048284 (BP CHEM INT LTD); | [Y]US3947433 (WITT DONALD R); | [X]EP0067598 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]EP0018108 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0193146 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) |