Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE66644T | 15.09.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | EP87118449 | 12.12.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3772537D1 | 02.10.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | DE3772537 | 12.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0272567 | Global Dossier | 28.08.1991 | B1 | EP0272567 | 29.06.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3644143 | 07.02.1991 | C2 | DE3644143 | 14.07.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2024485 | 01.03.1992 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI88275C | 26.04.1993 | C | FI88275B | 15.01.1993 | B | FI875606 | 24.06.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX159997 | 27.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4896740 | 30.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3644143 | 23.12.1986 |