EP0320521 - Artificial hair and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki City, Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Katsura Kuraray's House 5B-11 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Kawamoto, Masao Kuraray's House 2B-5 1-1 Mizue Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Sanada, Sadao 57-4 Asabara Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [1989/25] | 01 /
Maeda, Katsura Kuraray's House 5B-11 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | ||
02 /
Kawamoto, Masao Kuraray's House 2B-5 1-1 Mizue Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | |||
03 /
Sanada, Sadao 57-4 Asabara Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118561.7 | 15.12.1987 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320521 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320521 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/02, A41G3/00 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
A41G3/0083 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2927 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2931 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Künstliches Haar und seine Herstellung | [1989/25] | English: | Artificial hair and production thereof | [1989/25] | French: | Chevelure artificielle et sa fabrication | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 15.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.1993 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 02.07.1993 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1993
19.04.1994
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Hoechst AG Brüningstrasse 50 D-65926 Franfurt/Main / DE Opponents representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2010/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1993
19.04.1994
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Hoechst AG Brüningstrasse 50 D-65926 Franfurt/Main / DE Opponents representative Heyer, Volker, et al, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1993
19.04.1994
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Hoechst AG Brüningstrasse 50 D-65926 Franfurt/Main / DE Opponents representative Wehnert, Werner, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1993
Hoechst AG Brüningstrasse 50 D-65926 Franfurt/Main / DE Opponents representative Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Appeal following opposition | 13.08.1993 | Appeal received No. T0748/93 | 13.08.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.12.2002 | LU | 15.12.2002 | SE | 16.12.2002 | BE | 31.12.2002 | CH | 31.12.2002 | LI | 31.12.2002 | DE | 01.07.2003 | NL | 01.07.2003 | FR | 01.09.2003 | IT | 15.12.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/39] | GB | 15.12.2002 | |
LU | 15.12.2002 | ||
SE | 16.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
FR | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 15.12.2002 | |
SE | 16.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
FR | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/18] | SE | 16.12.2002 | |
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
FR | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | SE | 16.12.2002 | |
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | SE | 16.12.2002 | |
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
DE | 01.07.2003 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | SE | 16.12.2002 | |
CH | 31.12.2002 | ||
LI | 31.12.2002 | ||
NL | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 16.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2016364 (KURURAY CO LTD); | [Y]EP0227886 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [YD]DE3431886 (BERGMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | Examination | US4032685 | US4311761 |