EP0274694 - Heat exchange module made of burned ceramic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganz, Rudolf Dr. Raiffeisenstrasse 18 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Heinz, Otto Bahnhofstrasse 66 D-6078 Neu-Isenburg / DE | 03 /
Schelter, Heinrich Unterweissenbach 75 D-8672 Selb / DE | [1988/29] | Application number, filing date | 87118637.5 | 16.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863643750 | 20.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643750 | [1988/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274694 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274694 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F28F21/04, F28F3/08 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
F28F21/04 (EP,US);
F28F3/086 (EP,US);
Y10S165/36 (EP,US);
Y10S165/905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Wärmetauschermodul aus gebranntem keramischen Material | [1988/29] | English: | Heat exchange module made of burned ceramic material | [1988/29] | French: | Module d'échange de chaleur en matériau céramique cuit | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2152729 (OSTBO KARL); | [AD]DE3136253 (ROSENTHAL TECHNIK AG [DE]); | [A]EP0077656 (AVCO CORP [US]) |