EP0275509 - Apparatus with a blocking ring for roll-up doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menke, Wilhelm Anettestrasse 6 D-4425 Billerbeck / DE | [1988/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118797.7 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | DE19873701251 | 17.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3701251 | [1988/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275509 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275509 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275509 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/82 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
E06B9/84 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/30] | E06B9/209 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Fangvorrichtung für Rolltore mit Klemmring | [1988/30] | English: | Apparatus with a blocking ring for roll-up doors | [1988/30] | French: | Dispositif antichute avec anneau de blocage pour portes enroulables | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2708087 (NEUKIRCHEN W U H); | [A]DE3140792 (TIMMER JOSEF GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE3300215 (NEUKIRCHEN W U H [DE]) |