EP0277334 - Expansion joint seal, frame and assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.11.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rizza, Michael 2863 Encina Camino Walnut Creek California 94598 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states Rizza, Michael 2863 Encina Camino Walnut Creek California 94598 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118816.5 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | US19870000786 | 06.01.1987 Original published format: US 786 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277334 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/68 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
E04B1/6804 (EP,US);
E04B1/6815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Dichtung für Dehnungsfuge, Einfassung und Zusammensetzungsverfahren | [1988/32] | English: | Expansion joint seal, frame and assembly | [1988/32] | French: | Etanchéité pour joint de dilatation, support et assemblage | [1988/32] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 24.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/03] | 23.08.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH586790 (KOBER AG); | [A]US4295315 (LYNN-JONES DAVID M, et al); | [A]CH550294 (HONEGGER HEINZ); | [A]US3767311 (LEE PARE R); | [AD]US4290713 (BROWN DELMONT D, et al) |