EP0273315 - Ammine-N-heterocyclic-platinum complexes and antitumor agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8 Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [1988/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Totani, Tetsushi 1-15-2, Tsukimiyama Takarazuka-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Aono, Katsutoshi B-308, 2-529-3, Gakuenasahimotomachi Nara-shi / JP | 03 /
Adachi, Yasuko 2-11-17, Noda Fukushima-ku Osaka / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118819.9 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860303529 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30352986 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273315 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273315 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, A61K31/555 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
C07F17/02 (KR);
A61K31/555 (KR);
C07F15/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Ammine-N-heterocyclische Platinkomplexe und Antitumormittel | [1988/27] | English: | Ammine-N-heterocyclic-platinum complexes and antitumor agents | [1988/27] | French: | Complexes de platine ammine-N-hétérocycliques et agents antitumeurs | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 27.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6137795 ; | [AD]EP0057023 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]); | [A]EP0176005 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 17, 27th October 1986, page 719, column 2, abstract no. 153339d, Columbus, Ohio, US; N. KIHARA et al.: "Pyrrolidine-platinum complexes as antineoplastics", & JP - A - 61 37795, & JP6137795 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, no. 10, 8th March 1976, page 509, column 2, abstract no. 66857a, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. MARTELLI et al.: "Electrochemistry of coordination compounds. VII. Comparison between the polarographic behavior and the nucleophilic substitution reactions in platinum(II) complexes", & J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM. INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEM. 1975, 63(3), 421-423 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 14, 9th April 1973, page 337, column 2, abstract no. 89212b, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y.N. KUKUSHKIN et al.: "Stability of platinum(II) complexes with secondary heterocyclic amines", & ZH. NEORG. KHIM. 1973, 18(1), 182-188 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 2, 12th July 1971, page 615, column 1, abstract no. 14425c, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y.N. KUKUSHKIN et al.: "Reaction of platinum(II) complexes with biologically active heterocyclic amines", & ZH. NEORG. KHIM. 1971, 16(4), 1134-1138 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, vol 93, 1980, abstract No. 153339d |